This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:18:27 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS PETRA M BERUMEN

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PETRA M BERUMEN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4847

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

PETRA M BERUMEN

BERUMEN, PETRA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON PETRA M BERUMEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: BERUMEN PETRA M; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CACH, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON PETRA M BERUMEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0484-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280484 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Chris D. Mandarich, SB 220693; Ryan E. Vos, SB 224368; Rebecca E. Hunter, ‘ Nathaniel Clark, SB 276621; Jo-Anna Nieves, SB 276807 SFTZEJ E B

Mandarich Law Group, LLP U 6301 Owensmouth Avenue, Suite 850 SAN MATEO COUNTY Woodland Hills, CA 91367 JUN 2 6 2012

Local: 818-264-0111 Toll Free: 877-414-0130 Facsimile: 818-888-1260

Attorneys for Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO SOUTHERN BRANCH: HALL OF JUSTICE AND RECORDS - LIMITED JURISDICTION

Case No.:7

COMPLAINT FOR:

1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. COMMON COUNTS

CACH, LLC, Plaintiff, vs.

PETRA M BERUMEN, an individual; and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive.

s’

Defendants. DEMAND: $3,077.52

Plaintiff alleges:

Xvd A9 3114

FACTS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

1. Plaintiff is and at all times herein mentioned was, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, and assignee of original creditor, WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK.

2. Plaintiff is informed and believes that Defendants are individuals who currently reside within the jurisdictional boundaries of the above entitled Court. Therefore, this Court is the proper Court for trial of this action.

3. Plaintiff is unaware of the true names or capacities, whether individual, corporate, associate or otherwise of the Defendants sued herein as DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, and therefore, sues the Defendants by such fictitious names. Plaintiff will amend this Complaint to show their true names and

capacities once ascertained.

capacities once ascertained. 4, Plaintiff believes that at all times mentioned herein, each of the Defendants was, and is, the agent, servant and employee, employer of each of the other Defendants, and also acted in the capacity of and as agent of the other Defendants. Plaintiff also believes that the individual Defendants, and each of them, are jointly and severally liable that the actions described herein were taken as actions for the benefit of the Defendants’ separate and/or community property.

4, Plaintiff believes that at all times mentioned herein, each of the Defendants was, and is, the agent, servant and employee, employer of each of the other Defendants, and also acted in the capacity of and as agent of the other Defendants. Plaintiff also believes that the individual Defendants, and each of them, are jointly and severally liable that the actions described herein were taken as actions for the benefit of the Defendants’ separate and/or community property.

5. Plaintiff believes that, for value received, Defendants, and each of them, executed and delivered a credit card application to WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK (Plaintiff’s assignor) or made such application for credit over the telephone or Intemet. Pursuant to the terms of the application and the written terms and conditions sent along with the credit card, Plaintjff’s assignor provided Defendants with a credit card, and granted charge privileges on the credit card, account number XXXXXXXXXXXX5570 (the “Account™).

6. Prior to the commencement of this action, the Account was assigned for value by WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK (Plaintiff’s assignor) to the Plaintiff and Plaintiff is its current holder.

7. Defendants agreed to comply with the written terms and conditions governing the use of the Account, as it was amended from time to time, including repaying the Plaintiff’s assignor for any charges on the Account including, but not limited to, charges for the purchase of goods and services and/or cash advances and balance transfers along with the interest, late charges, over limit charges related thereto.

8. Defendants used the credit card issued on the Account to make credit card purchases and/or to take cash advances and/or to make balance transfers. Each time the Defendants used the credit card to purchase goods and services and/or to take cash advances and/or make balance transfers, Defendants reaffirmed their agreement to repay Plaintiff’s assignor for the amount for the purchase and/or cash advance and/or balance transfer, along with such other charges as may be assessed pursuant to the terms and conditions governing the Account.

9. Pursuant to the terms and conditions governing the Account, monthly statements were sent to the Defendants which itemized all payments made and charges due on the Account.

10. Within the last four years, the Defendants failed to make payments as agreed on the Account. Defendants have failed, refused and neglected to pay amounts due per the terms and conditions governing

the Account.

the Account. 11. As of April 10, 2012, Defendants owe the sum of $3,077.52 with interest thereon. 12. Although demand has been made upon Defendants to pay said amount, no part has been paid,

11. As of April 10, 2012, Defendants owe the sum of $3,077.52 with interest thereon. 12. Although demand has been made upon Defendants to pay said amount, no part has been paid,

and it is now due, owing, and unpaid together with interest thereon plus attorney’s fees.

13. Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s assignor have duly performed all promises, conditions and agreements on their part to be performed. 14, The terms and conditions governing the Account provides that the accountholder agrees to

reimburse Plaintiff’s assignor and hence, Plaintiff for the costs and expenses, including reasonable attorney’s fees, related to the collection of amounts owing on the Account. Plaintiff has been required to retain the Mandarich Law Group, LLP to pursue collection of the amounts due hereunder.

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

(Breach of Contract)

15. Plaintiff refers to and incorporates paragraphs 1 through 14,

16. Defendants have breached the terms and conditions governing the Account by failing to pay amounts due and owing on the Account.

17. As the direct and proximate result thereof, Plaintiff has been damaged in the amount of $3,077.52 plus interest thereon.

SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION

(Account Stated)

18. Plaintiff refers to and incorporates paragraph 1 through 17.

XV4 A4 3114

19. Within the past four years, an account was stated in writing in which it was agreed that Defendants were indebted in the amount of $3,077.52. Although demand has been made upon Defendants, no part of said amount has been paid, and it is now due, owing and unpaid from Defendants to Plaintiff with interest thereon from and after April 10, 2012.

WHEREFORE, Plaintiff prays for judgment against Defendants, and each of them, as follows:

1. For the damages and money in the sum of $3,077.52;

2 For interest thereon at 10 percent per annum from on and after April 10, 2012;

3. For reasonable attorney’s fees; 4

For costs of suit incurred; and

For costs of suit incurred; and —t

—t

HWN O 00 3 O W

5. 6. Dated: May 29, 2012

For such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper; Plaintiff remits all damages in excess of the jurisdictional amount of this Court.

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP