This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:20 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS PENI PAHULU

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PENI PAHULU. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4844

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

PENI PAHULU

PAHULU, PENI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

WRIT (13) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ORANGE COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO PENI PAHULU.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO PENI PAHULU, BY SUB-SERVING JESSICA PAHULU. MAILING DATE OF 07/09/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

CHANGE OF ADDRESS (55) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/27/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (5) Comment DEC: DECLARATION ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CACH, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $113.65, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (D)

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CACH LLC; Awarded Against: PAHULU, PENI; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/27/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FOR CACH, LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST PENI PAHULU PRINCIPAL IS $5,471.74. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $1,070.00. INTEREST IS $580.50. COSTS ARE $285.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,407.24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (13) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ORANGE COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: CHANGE OF ADDRESS (55) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 131114-0151-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7545.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CACH, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $113.65, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 131007-0473-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $7407.24

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0493-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280493 CACH, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less