This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:03 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS OLGA L DORANTES

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLGA L DORANTES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4823

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

OLGA L DORANTES

DORANTES, OLGA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION (12) Comment D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY CACH LLC

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment REQDNE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: THE DAMAGES FOR THE JUDGMENT ARE MORE THAN THE PRAYER AMOUNT ON THE COMPLAINT.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (14) Comment DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY CACH LLC

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

CHANGE OF ADDRESS (56) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON OLGA L DORANTES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/05/12.

Conversion Action.

ORDER (7) Comment DOCALO: DECLARATION AND ORDER THAT COPY BE ACCEPTED IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FILED BY CACH LLC

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST (11) Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO OLGA L DORANTES.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT (8) Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/13/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (10) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

DECLARATION (13) Comment DAI: DECLARATION FOR ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $249.12 FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CACH LLC; Awarded Against: DORANTES, OLGA L; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/13/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FOR CACH, LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST OLGA L DORANTES PRINCIPAL IS $2,625.33. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $249.12. COSTS ARE $241.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,115.45.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: CHANGE OF ADDRESS (56) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $3115.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $241.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $249.12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $2625.33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST OLGA L DORANTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FOR CACH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Clerk. Additional Info: JUDGMENT (8) Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/13/14 AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0602-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280602 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less