This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:26 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS NORMITA C LACAP

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORMITA C LACAP. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4842

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

NORMITA C LACAP

LACAP, NORMITA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

CHANGE OF ADDRESS (16) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (5) Comment DEC: DECLARATION ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (D)

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO NORMITA C LACAP, BY SUB-SERVING JEMIMAH DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/03/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (6) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO NORMITA C LACAP.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/27/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CACH LLC; Awarded Against: LACAP, NORMITA C; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/27/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FOR CACH, LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST NORMITA C LACAP PRINCIPAL IS $4,490.98. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $898.19. INTEREST IS $169.74. COSTS ARE $241.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,799.91.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: CHANGE OF ADDRESS (16) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $5799.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $241.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $169.74.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $898.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $4490.98.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST NORMITA C LACAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FOR CACH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Clerk. Additional Info: JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/27/13 AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0544-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270544 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less