This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:32 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS MARIA L. BRACAMONTES

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA L BRACAMONTES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4852

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

MARIA L BRACAMONTES

BRACAMONTES, MARIA L

Not Classified By Court

Payor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO MARIA L BRACAMONTES, BY SUB-SERVING FRANCISCO CHAVEZ, BROTHER/CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/10/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CACH, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $294.10, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Document.

FILING (29) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

CHANGE OF ADDRESS (65) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

Declaration.

DECLARATION (5) Comment DEC: DECLARATION ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO MARIA L BRACAMONTES.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (D))

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (4) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CACH, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,231.00, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 407 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 4077.07, COST 75.00, CREDIT 2943.89.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/26/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CACH LLC; Awarded Against: BRACAMONTES, MARIA L; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/26/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FOR CACH, LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARIA L BRACAMONTES PRINCIPAL IS $10,504.94. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $1,530.00. INTEREST IS $1,123.20. COSTS ARE $430.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $13,588.14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 407 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 4077.07, COST 75.00, CREDIT 2943.89.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (29) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: CHANGE OF ADDRESS (65) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 141014-0919-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $12295.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2548.43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (4) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CACH, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,231.00, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (3) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 131227-0024-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0409-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280409 CACH, LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less