This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:21:26 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS LUIS MANRIQUEZ

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUIS MANRIQUEZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4836

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

LUIS MANRIQUEZ

MANRIQUEZ, LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

CHANGE OF ADDRESS (21) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/27/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION (5) Comment DEC: DECLARATION ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Declaration.

DECLARATION (6) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (D)

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO LUIS MANRIQUEZ, BY SUB-SERVING LAURA MANTIQUEZ. MAILING DATE OF 07/09/12.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC AS TO LUIS MANRIQUEZ.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CACH LLC; Awarded Against: MANRIQUEZ, LUIS; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/27/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FOR CACH, LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LUIS MANRIQUEZ PRINCIPAL IS $4,378.39. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $875.67. INTEREST IS $154.80. COSTS ARE $241.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,649.86.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: CHANGE OF ADDRESS (21) Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $5649.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $241.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $154.80.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $875.67.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $4378.39.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LUIS MANRIQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FOR CACH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Clerk. Additional Info: JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 08/27/13 AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0522-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270522 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less