This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:14 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS INGRID O. GULLE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INGRID O GULLE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4824

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

INGRID O GULLE

GULLE, INGRID O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON INGRID O GULLE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/10/12.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FILED BY INGRID O GULLE, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL FEE GRANTED FOR INGRID GULLE SIGNED BY VRS ON 09/14/12 FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY INGRID O GULLE GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $181.00 SIGNED BY VRS ON 09/14/12.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY (WITH NO NAME OF PARTY SERVED; DATE OF MAILING;ETC FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: GULLE INGRID O; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CACH, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: ORDER Comment O2: ORDER FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL FEE GRANTED FOR INGRID GULLE SIGNED BY VRS ON 09/14/12 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees. Additional Info: Comment APWFS: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY INGRID O GULLE FOR JURY FEES AND EXPENSES; REPORTER'S DAILY FEES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Waiver Granted. Additional Info: ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY INGRID O GULLE GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $181.00 SIGNED BY VRS ON 09/14/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Request to Waive Court Fees. Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY INGRID O GULLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited). Additional Info: ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FILED BY INGRID O GULLE, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY (WITH NO NAME OF PARTY SERVED; DATE OF MAILING;ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON INGRID O GULLE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/10/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0596-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280596 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less