This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:21:23 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS DIMA A. ABUGEITH

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIMA A ABUGEITH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4837

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

DIMA A. ABUGEITH

ABUGEITH, DIMA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: ABUGEITH DIMA A.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CACH, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0526-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270526 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less