This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:25 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS DAN NEBALASCA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAN NEBALASCA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4850

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

DAN NEBALASCA

So San Francisco, CA 94080

NEBALASCA, DAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON DAN NEBALASCA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/12.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FILED BY DAN NEBALASCA, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: NEBALASCA DAN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CACH, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0720-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Limited up to $10000). Additional Info: ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC FILED BY DAN NEBALASCA, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC SERVED ON DAN NEBALASCA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0452-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for NEBALASCA, DAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060720 NEBALASCA, DAN $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for NEBALASCA, DAN : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: NEBALASCA, DAN; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280452 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less