This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:58:26 (UTC).

BUISAN FAMILY TRUST VS EDGAR MEJIA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 BUISAN FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EDGAR MEJIA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6403

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUISAN FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

MEJIA, EDGAR

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

MEJIA, SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATLIN, SHAUNA L

 

Court Documents

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRU Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AS TO EDGAR MEJIA SANDRA MEJIA, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 FILED. Comment PSUO: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 FILED. TYPE OF SERVICE: POSTING AND MAILING DATE: 08/14/12

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES: Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Summons Issued / Filed.

5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

Order.

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED BY JUDGE FREEMAN ON 08/14/12, FILED. Comment O: ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING, SIGNED BY JUDGE FREEMAN ON 08/14/12, FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AS TO SANDRA MEJ Comment PSPM: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AS TO SANDRA MEJIA FILED SHOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING. DATE OF MAILING: 08/14/12.

Conversion Action.

APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING FILED BY BUISAN FAMILY TRUST Comment APL: APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING FILED BY BUISAN FAMILY TRUST

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AS TO EDGAR MEJI Comment PSPM: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AS TO EDGAR MEJIA FILED SHOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING. DATE OF MAILING: 08/14/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Conversion Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: BUISAN FAMILY TRUST; Awarded Against: MEJIA EDGAR; MEJIA, SANDRA; ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/30/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST FOR BUISAN FAMILY TRUST JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AGAINST EDGAR MEJIA, SANDRA MEJIA, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 942 ANTOINETTE LANE UNIT 02 SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO CA. 94080.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120830-0467-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFPP: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 942 ANTOINETTE LANE UNIT 02 SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO CA. 94080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST AGAINST EDGAR MEJIA SANDRA MEJIA, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF BUISAN FAMILY TRUST FOR BUISAN FAMILY TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JOAF1: JUDGMENT ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES: Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice. Additional Info: Comment UDN: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING NOTICES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES PER CCP 1161.2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Case Sealed by Order. Additional Info: Comment SEALUD: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SEALED PER CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DRAD1: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $46.50; ADDRESS 942 ANTOINETTE LANE UNIT 02 SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO CA. 94080; 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120814-0570-CK 171/ 240.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 942 ANTOINETTE LANE UNIT 02 SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO CA94080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Financial info for BUISAN FAMILY TRUST : Case Payment Receipt # 201208140570 BUISAN FAMILY TRUST $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Financial info for BUISAN FAMILY TRUST : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Financial: BUISAN FAMILY TRUST; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less