This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 00:05:15 (UTC).

Bryan Harrison vs Principia Biopharma Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Bryan Harrison filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Principia Biopharma Inc . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S., Weiner and Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3966

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Weiner

Judges

Weiner, Marie S.

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harrison, Bryan

Defendants

Babler, Martin

Lin, Shao-Lee

Colowick, Alan B.

Principia Biopharma Inc.

Becker, Dan

Tomasello, Shawn

George, Simeon

Machado, Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, EVAN J.

 

Court Documents

Judgment of Dismissal.

Judgment of Dismissal and ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSALSigned by Judge Comment and ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Signed by Judge Weiner On 11/04/2020

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSALFWD: T Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FWD: TO DEPT. 2

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF EVAN J. SMITH OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment OF EVAN J. SMITH OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

Request.

Request FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Comment CMO #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order Comment CMO #1

Class Action Complex Notice.

Class Action Complex Notice

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons + Rider - Final.pdf

Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation.

CV-59 Signed.pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CA - Civil cover sheet - Signed.pdf

Complaint.

Complaint - Final - 20200916.pdf

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment COMPLEX CLASS ACTION SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 02:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment of Dismissal. Additional Info: Judgment of Dismissal and ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSALSigned by Judge Comment and ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Signed by Judge Weiner On 11/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSALFWD: T Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FWD: TO DEPT. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF EVAN J. SMITH OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment OF EVAN J. SMITH OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest. Additional Info: Request FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harrison, Bryan : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036287-HOJ Harrison, Bryan $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harrison, Bryan : Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Harrison, Bryan; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClass Action Complex Notice. Additional Info: Class Action Complex Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation. Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less