This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 12:39:06 (UTC).

BROADWAY GRILL, INC. vs VISA, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 BROADWAY GRILL, INC filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against VISA, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Weiner, Marie S, Etezadi, Susan I and Miram, George A. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0392

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Weiner, Marie S

Etezadi, Susan I

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADWAY GRILL, INC.

Defendants

VISA U.S.A., INC.

VISA INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION

VISA, INC.

DOES 1-500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOLUMPHY, MARK C

MURPHY, ANNE MARIE

Fineman, Nancy L.

GIBLIN, GWENDOLYN R

Cotchett, Joseph W.

Artiga-Purcell, Camilo

Defendant Attorneys

VIZAS, ROBERT JOHN

MAYO, SHARON D.

 

Court Documents

Opposition.

Opposition TO MOTION TO STAY ACTION Comment TO MOTION TO STAY ACTION

Notice.

Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by MAIL AND VIA E-MAIL of MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSI Comment MAIL AND VIA E-MAIL of MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; (PROPOSED) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERA Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Removal to Federal Court.

Removal to Federal Court NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT. Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT.

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by MAIL AND EMAIL ON 02/03/17; PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO CLERK OF FILING OF AMENDED CLA Comment MAIL AND EMAIL ON 02/03/17; PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO CLERK OF FILING OF AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; SEE SERVICE LIST.

Joint.

Joint CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement JOINT INITIAL CMC STATEMENT Comment JOINT INITIAL CMC STATEMENT

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: Fineman, Nancy L.Attorney: Artiga-Purcell, CamiloDefendantAttorney: VIZAS, ROBERT JOHNAttorney: MAYO, SHARON D.DefendantAttorney: VIZAS, ROBERT JOHNDefendantAttorney: VIZAS, ROBERT JOHNAttorney: MAYO, SHARON D.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice of Removal to Federal Court Comment NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice of Removal to Federal Court Comment NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL

Notice.

Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice.

Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CM Order #6 Comment CM Order #6

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CM Order #6 Comment CM Order #6

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CM Order #5 Comment CM Order #5

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CM Order #5 Comment CM Order #5

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CM Order #4 Comment CM Order #4

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketStatus Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.; Additional Info: Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice of Removal to Federal Court Comment NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court Exhibit A to Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CM Order #6 Comment CM Order #6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order.; Additional Info: Case Management Order CM Order #6 Comment CM Order #6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CM Order #5 Comment CM Order #5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order.; Additional Info: Case Management Order CM Order #5 Comment CM Order #5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketMotion Re: For Judgment on Pleadings.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketDiscovery Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT. Comment NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BROADWAY GRILL, INC.; Case Payment Receipt # 2016-027651-HOJ MOLUMPHY, MARK C $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BROADWAY GRILL, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; BROADWAY GRILL, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,605.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broadway Grill, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VISA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Visa is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTIGA-PURCELL, CAMILO