This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/20/2023 at 22:54:50 (UTC).

Bridgeport Homeowners Association vs. Michele Sarko

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Bridgeport Homeowners Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michele Sarko. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, WEINER, Chou, Danny Y, HILL and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2870

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

WEINER

Chou, Danny Y

HILL

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Bridgeport Homeowners Association

ROES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Sarko, Michele

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.

CEREGHINO, JEFFREY B

THOMPSON, BENJAMIN

WHITE, CASHEL C

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN, PHONG L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC - 5/17/2021 at 9:00 AM SSF Comment CMC - 5/17/2021 at 9:00 AM SSF

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Declaration.

Declaration CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 5950 Comment CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 5950

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC - 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM SSF Comment CMC - 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM SSF

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 5/17/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 5/17/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/08/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: CEREGHINO, JEFFREY B

Association of Counsel / Attorney.

Association of Counsel / Attorney Attorney: KEVIN CHOLAKIAN hereby associates withAttorney: RONALD Comment Attorney: KEVIN CHOLAKIAN hereby associates with Attorney: RONALD Q. TRAN

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

Order.

Order Type: JOINT STIPUATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PREJUDICE AND FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JU Comment Type: JOINT STIPUATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PREJUDICE AND FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 ORDER Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 03/07/2023

Notice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement.

Notice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire Case

Stipulation.

Stipulation MEMORANDUM OF SETTLEMENT Comment MEMORANDUM OF SETTLEMENT

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/16/2022 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment IN PERSON Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: CEREGHINO, JEFFREY BDefendant: Sarko, MicheleAttorney: TRAN, PHONG L.

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Order Order on Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Expert Witness I Comment Order Order on Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Expert Witness Information Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 2034.210

Order.

Order on Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Expert Witness Information Pursuant to Code Comment on Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Expert Witness Information Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 2034.210

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2023

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Party; Names; Bridgeport Homeowners Association; Sarko, Michele; ROES 1-20 INCLUSIVE; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION 664.6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: JOINT STIPUATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PREJUDICE AND FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JU Comment Type: JOINT STIPUATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PREJUDICE AND FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 ORDER Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 03/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Bridgeport Homeowners Association; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-006641-HOJ Bridgeport Homeowners Association $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Bridgeport Homeowners Association; Transaction Assessment $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketCourt Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketCourt Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Phase I of Bifurcated Trial: Equitable Claims. 3 day estimate (Feb. 2, 3, and 9, 2023) - In Person

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement.; Additional Info: Notice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketMotion to Extend Time.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2034.210

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Unconditional Settlement of Entire Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference AMENDED Comment AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

FinancialFinancial info for Bridgeport Homeowners Association; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-027455-HOJ Bridgeport Homeowners Association $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

FinancialFinancial info for Bridgeport Homeowners Association; Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

FinancialFinancial; Bridgeport Homeowners Association; Total Financial Assessment $985.00; Total Payments and Credits $985.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

DocketNew Filed Case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less