This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/31/2022 at 00:54:44 (UTC).

BRIAN MOORE AND NICOLE MOORE

Case Summary

On 06/10/2015 BRIAN MOORE AND NICOLE MOORE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holt, Rachel E, SWOPE, Hill, Elizabeth M, V. RAYMOND SWOPE, Swope, V. Raymond, Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula and Reyna, Renee C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9407

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holt, Rachel E

SWOPE

Hill, Elizabeth M

V. RAYMOND SWOPE

Swope, V. Raymond

Cordova, Paula

Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula

Reyna, Renee C

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

MOORE, BRIAN

MOORE, NICOLE

Not Classified By Court

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OVERTON, ALLYSYN L

PETSAS, K. J.

Respondent Attorney

DUMONT, PAUL P.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Swope V Raymond Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LRespondent: MOORE, NICOLEAttorney: DUMONT, PAUL P.

Other hearing.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment Dept: 23 HEARING RE: REVIEW OF VISITATION. Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LRespondent: MOORE, NICOLEAttorney: DUMONT, PAUL P.

Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment RE: OSC and Affidavit for Contempt conference- set 3.23.17- Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LPetitioner: MOORE, NICOLEAttorney: PETSAS, K. J.

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment PROPERTY CONTROL AND OTHER: FAMC271 SANCTIONS/ ENFORCE 3/8/16 ORDER Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LPetitionerAttorney: PETSAS, K. J.

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel.

*FAM Minute Order - Motion to be Relieved as Counsel 07/17/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held -

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 07/17/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment BIFURCATION/STATUS Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN L

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 07/17/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment RE: TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDERS, ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS, OTHER; RESPONDENT TO SIGN QUIT CLAIM DEED; ETC Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN L

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 08/21/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment CHILD CUSTODY Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LRespondent: MOORE, NICOLE

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/01/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LRespondent: MOORE, NICOLE

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/08/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LRespondent: MOORE, NICOLE

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 10/23/2017 Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Comment FCS Report, Child Custody

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of service by Mail re: Child Support Documents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation & Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketStipulation sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification.; Additional Info: Original Type DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment CHILD SUPPORT , HEALTH CARE, OTHER:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order RE: Modification.; Additional Info: Original Type Request for Order RE: Modification Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment FCS Report Parties Present Petitioner: MOORE, BRIANAttorney: OVERTON, ALLYSYN LRespondent: MOORE, NICOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Comment SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRIAN MOORE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Comment SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRIAN MOORE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDER; POS-040; POS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
273 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOORE, BRIAN; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • FinancialFinancial; MOORE, BRIAN; Total Financial Assessment $1,467.50; Total Payments and Credits $1,467.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution with Minor Child File Date 06/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 23 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150610-0169-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Application - DV Prevention with Minor Child File Date 04/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dumont Esq., Paul P.