This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:25 (UTC).

BRIAN HEFFNER VS SEFO TOVO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 BRIAN HEFFNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEFO TOVO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6200

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEFFNER, BRIAN

HEFFNER, WENLI

Defendants

TOVO, LANGITOTO

TOVO, TONY

POHIVA, VIDA

TOVO, SEFO

POHIVA, SIONE

TOVO, MAU

TOVO, SEFA

TOVO, LEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES: Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER WITHOUT PREJUDIC Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON SIONE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON SIONE POHIVA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON LANGI Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON LANGITOTO TOVO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON SEFO Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON SEFO TOVO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER AS TO SEF Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER AS TO SEFO TOVO LANGITOTO TOVO, SIONE POHIVA, VIDA POHIVA, TONY TOVO, MAU TOVO, LEO TOVO.

Summons Issued / Filed.

5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON VIDA Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON VIDA POHIVA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON MAU T Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON MAU TOVO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON TONY Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON TONY TOVO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON LEO T Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER SERVED ON LEO TOVO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/12.

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Conversion Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: HEFFNER BRIAN; HEFFNER, WENLI; Awarded Against: TOVO, SEFO; TOVO, LANGITOTO; POHIVA, SIONE; POHIVA, VIDA; TOVO, TONY; TOVO, MAU; TOVO, LEO; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/03/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER FOR BRIAN HEFFNER, WENLI HEFFNER JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER AGAINST SEFO TOVO, LANGITOTO TOVO, SIONE POHIVA, VIDA POHIVA, TONY TOVO, MAU TOVO, LEO TOVO JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 2326 RALMAR AVENUE EAST PALO ALTO CA. 94303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120705-0063-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFPP: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 2326 RALMAR AVENUE EAST PALO ALTO CA. 94303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER AGAINST SEFO TOVO LANGITOTO TOVO, SIONE POHIVA, VIDA POHIVA, TONY TOVO, MAU TOVO, LEO TOVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF HEFFNER FOR BRIAN HEFFNER WENLI HEFFNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JOAF1: JUDGMENT ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES: Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice. Additional Info: Comment UDN: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING NOTICES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES PER CCP 1161.2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case Sealed by Order. Additional Info: Comment SEALUD: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SEALED PER CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DRAD1: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $68.33; ADDRESS 2326 RALMAR AVENUE EAST PALO ALTO CA. 94303; 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0015-CK 171/ 240.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 2326 RALMAR AVENUE EAST PALO ALTO CA94303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for HEFFNER, BRIAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270015 HEFFNER, BRIAN $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for HEFFNER, BRIAN : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: HEFFNER, BRIAN; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less