This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:23 (UTC).

BRADLEY TEERLINK vs. SALVADOR PEREZ, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 BRADLEY TEERLINK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALVADOR PEREZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L. and Karesh, Jonathan E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2815

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEERLINK, BRADLEY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

PEREZ, SALVADOR

MUNOZ, JAIME

DOTY PLASTERING AND DRYWALL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COATES, LYNNE M.

Defendant Attorney

SWENSEN, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees AND DEMAND FOR JURY Comment AND DEMAND FOR JURY

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/04/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: TEERLINK BRADLEY; PEREZ, SALVADOR; MUNOZ, JAIME; DOTY PLASTERING AND DRYWALL, INC.; DOES 1 TO 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 11 STIP & ORDER TO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • ADR Stipulation and Order Due in Clerk's Office.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for MUNOZ, JAIME : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-049348-HOJ PACIFIC COAST LEGAL SERVICES, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for MUNOZ, JAIME : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial: MUNOZ, JAIME; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for PEREZ, SALVADOR : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-049348-HOJ PACIFIC COAST LEGAL SERVICES, INC. $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for PEREZ, SALVADOR : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for PEREZ, SALVADOR : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial: PEREZ, SALVADOR; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for TEERLINK, BRADLEY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037482-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for TEERLINK, BRADLEY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: TEERLINK, BRADLEY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less