This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:58 (UTC).

BLESILLE BALILING, et al vs. JOAN AGUADERA VILLENA

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 BLESILLE BALILING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOAN AGUADERA VILLENA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mazzei, Cristina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0728

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mazzei, Cristina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRUZ, RONNIE DELA

BALILING, BLESILLE

Defendant

VILLENA, JOAN AGUADERA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL.

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by ILLEGIBLE Hearing Date Comment Signed for by ILLEGIBLE Hearing Date

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim.

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/25/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: CRUZ, RONNIE DELADefendant: VILLENA, JOAN AGUADERA

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Mazzei Cristina; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To: VILLENA, JOAN AGUADERA; Awarded Against: BALILING, BLESILLE; CRUZ, RONNIE DELA; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS.; Party; Names: BALILING, BLESILLE; CRUZ, RONNIE DELA; VILLENA, JOAN AGUADERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • No Longer Under Submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Matter Taken Under Submission. Additional Info: Comment Matter under submission:Small Claims Judicial officer:Mazzei

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/25/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: CRUZ, RONNIE DELADefendant: VILLENA, JOAN AGUADERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL. Additional Info: Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by ILLEGIBLEHearing Date 07/25/2018 Comment Signed for by ILLEGIBLE Hearing Date 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CRUZ, RONNIE DELA : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037378-HOJ CRUZ, RONNIE DELA $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CRUZ, RONNIE DELA : Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CRUZ, RONNIE DELA; Total Financial Assessment $15.00; Total Payments and Credits $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for BALILING, BLESILLE : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037366-HOJ BALILING, BLESILLE $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for BALILING, BLESILLE : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: BALILING, BLESILLE; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less