This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 19:02:57 (UTC).

Billy Wineinger vs. AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST, et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Billy Wineinger filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A, HEALY, Chou, Danny Y, Healy, Nicole S and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3208

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

HEALY

Chou, Danny Y

Healy, Nicole S

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wineinger, Billy

Defendants

AMR

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE

DOES 1 TO 20

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDMOND, TERENCE A.

Defendant Attorney

KANTER, SCOTT R

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDI Comment DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

Hearing on Demurrer.

Original Type Hearing on Demurrer ~CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 10/21/2021 Judicial Officer Healy Nicole S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF HEARING RE DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICA Comment NOTICE OF HEARING RE DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST; ETC...

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: KANTER, SCOTT R

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/28/2022 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: REDMOND, TERENCE A.DefendantAttorney: KANTER, SCOTT R

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference - 3/28/2022 at 9 AM Comment - 3/28/2022 at 9 AM

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer..

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Order.

Order Type: RE DEMURRERSigned by: JUDGE HEALYDate Signed: 12/20/2021 Comment Type: RE DEMURRER Signed by: JUDGE HEALY Date Signed: 12/20/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 1/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 1/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/28/2022 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: REDMOND, TERENCE A.DefendantAttorney: KANTER, SCOTT R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference - 3/28/2022 at 9 AM Comment - 3/28/2022 at 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Meet and confer..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: RE DEMURRERSigned by: JUDGE HEALYDate Signed: 12/20/2021 Comment Type: RE DEMURRER Signed by: JUDGE HEALY Date Signed: 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST Comment DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wineinger, Billy; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023376-HOJ Wineinger, Billy $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wineinger, Billy; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Wineinger, Billy; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMR is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANTER, SCOTT R