This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 18:07:23 (UTC).

BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company vs. Jessica Lopez, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jessica Lopez,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3110

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company

Defendants

Lopez, Jessica

DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-JUDGMENT SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-JUDGMENT SENT TO DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-JUDGMENT SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-JUDGMENT SENT TO PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Comment PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Comment pursuant to CCP 1788

Declaration.

Declaration OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTCCP 1788 Comment OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT CCP 1788

Declaration.

Declaration RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration of Non-Military Status.

Declaration of Non-Military Status

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Order Denying.

Order Denying SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS Comment SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES Comment PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Comment pursuant to CCP 1788

Declaration.

Declaration OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTCCP 1788 Comment OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT CCP 1788

Declaration.

Declaration RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration of Non-Military Status.

Declaration of Non-Military Status

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names; BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company; Lopez, Jessica; DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE; Comment: FILED ON 12/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying.; Additional Info: Order Denying SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS Comment SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name; DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES Comment PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.; Additional Info: Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Comment pursuant to CCP 1788

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTCCP 1788 Comment OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT CCP 1788

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Status.; Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Military Status

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-022128-HOJ BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; BH Financial Group, LLC, A Limited Liability Company; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in support of reduced filing fee.; Additional Info: Declaration in support of reduced filing fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BH FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenosian, John P