This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:47:35 (UTC).

BERNADETTE PADILLA VS SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 BERNADETTE PADILLA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L, Weiner, Marie S, Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Swope, V. Raymond, Weiner, Marie S., Dylina, Steven L. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8977

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Weiner, Marie S

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Swope, V. Raymond

Weiner, Marie S.

Dylina, Steven L.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERNADETTE PADILLA

PADILLA, BERNADETTE

Young, Andrea

Defendants

SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS

SUTTER BAY HOSPITALS

CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLUMENTHAL, NORMAN B.

NORDREHAUG, KYLE R

Defendant Attorney

CHEE, C. YEWLEH

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, DECLARATION OF NORMAN BLUMENTHAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement.

Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement

Statement.

Statement OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMEN Comment OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Motion.

Motion FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT Comment FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT Comment SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT

Declaration.

Declaration OF THOMAS E GEIDT IN SUPPORT OF DEFT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CH Comment OF THOMAS E GEIDT IN SUPPORT OF DEFT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS' MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee).

Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee) ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement.

*CIV Minute Order - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement 02/06/2018 Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of STIP AND ORDER TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment STIP AND ORDER TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order AGREEMENT AND ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 11/09/16 Comment AGREEMENT AND ORDER, SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 11/09/16

Order.

Order DEsignating Matter Complez and Assigning Case For All Purposes Comment DEsignating Matter Complez and Assigning Case For All Purposes

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Swope V. Raymond; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 664.6).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing. Additional Info: Order After Hearing Hearing Type: FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL PROCEDURE 664. Comment Hearing Type: FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6 Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 06/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorney Fees. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Attorney Fees 06/29/2018 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: NORDREHAUG, KYLE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement 06/29/2018 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: NORDREHAUG, KYLE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of. Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BERNELLA OSTERLUND RE: REQUESTS FOREXC Comment SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BERNELLA OSTERLUND RE: REQUESTS FOREXCLUSION served on GRUBE BROWN & GEIDT LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL OF BERNELLA OSTERLUND RE: REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSION Comment SUPPLEMENTAL OF BERNELLA OSTERLUND RE: REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Additional Info: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES COSTS AND SE Comment OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND SERVICE AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of. Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES COSTS AND Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND SERVICE AWARD, ETC served on GRUBE BROWN & GEIDT LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-008698-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-057263-HOJ PADILLA, BERNADETTE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Case Payment Receipt # 201606060493 PADILLA, BERNADETTE $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Case Payment Receipt # 201606060486 PADILLA, BERNADETTE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for PADILLA, BERNADETTE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial: PADILLA, BERNADETTE; Total Financial Assessment $1,745.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,745.00

    Read MoreRead Less