This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 12:37:53 (UTC).

BEECHAM PEARSON vs SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 BEECHAM PEARSON filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S., Fineman, Nancy L., Weiner, Marie S, Fineman, Nancy L, DAVIS, FINEMAN and Maxine Chesney. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5564

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S.

Fineman, Nancy L.

Weiner, Marie S

Fineman, Nancy L

Not Yet Classifieds

DAVIS

FINEMAN

Maxine Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEARSON, BEECHAM

HOSTAK, MICHAEL

LY, STEVEN

Defendants

SWENSON, SUSAN G.

HOCHSCHILD, MAURICE

WALKER, JAMES

NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION

KNEUER, JOHN

PLASCHKE, ROBERT

OPPENHEIMER & CO., INC.

JOHNSON, JEFFREY D.

HOWE, ALAN

SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

YOUNG, KENNY

LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC

DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KING, LAURENCE D.

JASNOCH, JOHN T

KATHREIN, REED R

Defendant Attorneys

CLOSE, MATTHEW WILLIAM

DOLAN, MATTHEW J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS'NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN SONIM DEFEN Comment UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS'NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN SONIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' UNTIMELY MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FO Comment REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS; ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Opposition.

Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS' UNTIMELY MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO D Comment TO PLAINTIFFS' UNTIMELY MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMIS Comment REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF MATTHEW W. CLOSE OF SONIM DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' UNTIMELY M Comment OF MATTHEW W. CLOSE OF SONIM DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' UNTIMELY MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

Memorandum of Costs.

Memorandum of Costs

Notice.

Notice (NO HEARING SCHEDULED PER DEPT.4)-NO FEE CHARGED OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN SONIM DEFENDANTS O Comment (NO HEARING SCHEDULED PER DEPT.4)-NO FEE CHARGED OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN SONIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' UNTIMELY MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

Hearing on Joinder.

Original Type Hearing on Joinder ~CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Joinder 10/15/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 09:30 AM Result Held Comment UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' JOINDER IN SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' WAIVER OF APPEAL AND DEF Comment Type: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' WAIVER OF APPEAL AND DEFENDANTS' WAIVER OF COSTS Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 02/11/21

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) ; MEMORANDUM OF COSTS WORKSHEET serve Comment MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) ; MEMORANDUM OF COSTS WORKSHEET served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Memorandum of Costs.

Memorandum of Costs

Memorandum of Costs.

Memorandum of Costs

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Comment GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENSSigned by: JU Comment Type: GRANTING SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 12/04/20.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' ALTERNATIVE PROPSED MARKUP OF TENTATIVE Comment PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' ALTERNATIVE PROPSED MARKUP OF TENTATIVE RULING ON SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Notice.

Notice PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' ALTERNATIVE PROPOSED MARKUP OF TENTATIVE RULING ON SONIM DEFENDAN Comment PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' ALTERNATIVE PROPOSED MARKUP OF TENTATIVE RULING ON SONIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

242 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order.; Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' WAIVER OF APPEAL AND DEF Comment Type: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' WAIVER OF APPEAL AND DEFENDANTS' WAIVER OF COSTS Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 02/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LY, STEVEN; Case Payment Receipt # 2021-005986-HOJ SWIFT ATTORNEY SERVICE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LY, STEVEN; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; LY, STEVEN; Total Financial Assessment $20.00; Total Payments and Credits $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) ; MEMORANDUM OF COSTS WORKSHEET serve Comment MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) ; MEMORANDUM OF COSTS WORKSHEET served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs.; Additional Info: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs.; Additional Info: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Comment GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Party; Names; PEARSON, BEECHAM; SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.; PLASCHKE, ROBERT; WALKER, JAMES; HOCHSCHILD, MAURICE; HOWE, ALAN; YOUNG, KENNY; SWENSON, SUSAN G.; KNEUER, JOHN; JOHNSON, JEFFREY D.; OPPENHEIMER & CO., INC.; NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION; LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC; LY, STEVEN; DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE; HOSTAK, MICHAEL; OPPENHEIMER & CO., INC.; NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION; LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC; NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION; LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC; OPPENHEIMER & CO., INC.; NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION; LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC; OPPENHEIMER & CO., INC.; SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for PEARSON, BEECHAM; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-058520-HOJ PEARSON, BEECHAM $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for PEARSON, BEECHAM; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; PEARSON, BEECHAM; Total Financial Assessment $2,495.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClass Action Complex Notice.; Additional Info: Class Action Complex Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation.; Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lake Street Capital Markets, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where National Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonim Technologies, Inc. is a litigant