This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 01:14:15 (UTC).

BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION vs. MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Healy, Nicole S., Halperin, Ernst A, Weiner, Marie S, Chou, Danny Y and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2676

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Healy, Nicole S., Halperin, Ernst A

Weiner, Marie S

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1-40, INCLUSIVE

MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSEY, CHRISTOPHER J.

Defendant Attorneys

ROONEY, KEVIN F.

KORBEL, GREGORY J

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens).

Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Order.

Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: BAY MOUNTAIN AIR INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; DOES 1-40, INCLUSIVE; Comment: PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer(s) Healy Nicole S., Halperin, Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens). Additional Info: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023614-HOJ AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-018201-HOJ BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hersey, Christopher J.