This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:58:06 (UTC).

BAO RUI XU V JING HUA WANG

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 BAO RUI XU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JING HUA WANG. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6859

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAO RUI XU

Cupertino, CA 95014

XU, BAO RUI

Defendants

JING HUA WANG

WANG, JING HUA

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF XU FILED

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

APPLICATION Comment APJD2: (SC) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JING HUA WANG FILED BY BAO RUI XU

Plaintiff's Claim.

CLAIM Comment PCF3: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF XU SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO JING HUA WANG ON 08/16/12 COSTS $60.00, HEARING DATE 09/21/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: XU BAO RUI; Awarded Against: WANG, JING HUA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/02/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF XU FOR BAO RUI XU JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF XU AGAINST JING HUA WANG DEFENDANT(S) JING HUA WANG SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF(S) BAO RUI XU $5,000.00 PRINCIPAL AND $135.00 COSTS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/02/12 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES 10/02/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: PARTY SATISFIED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JING HUA WANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • Judgment Debtor - Appearance. Additional Info: Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: SCC HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JING HUA WANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/02/12 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: ACKNOWLEDGMENT Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF XU FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121206-0523-CS 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination. Additional Info: APPLICATION Comment APJD2: (SC) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JING HUA WANG FILED BY BAO RUI XU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121105-0830-CC 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment SCAI: SMALL CLAIMS ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $7850.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: DEFENDANT HIRED PLAINTIFF TO DO VARIOUS CONSTRUCTION WORK, NEVER PAID, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0292-CK 005/ 75.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: CLAIM Comment PCF3: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Financial info for XU, BAO RUI : Case Payment Receipt # 201212060523 XU, BAO RUI $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Financial info for XU, BAO RUI : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for XU, BAO RUI : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060292 XU, BAO RUI $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for XU, BAO RUI : Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: XU, BAO RUI; Total Financial Assessment $135.00; Total Payments and Credits $135.00

    Read MoreRead Less