Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:41:54 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs. AILENE K ESTALILLA

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AILENE K ESTALILLA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2794

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

ESTALILLA, AILENE K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSCH, GEOFFREY M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT-CONTRACT ETC Comment SUMMONS COMPLAINT-CONTRACT, ETC

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Party; Names: BANK OF AMERICA N.A.; ESTALILLA, AILENE K; Comment: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED 09/28/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT-CONTRACT ETC Comment SUMMONS COMPLAINT-CONTRACT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037357-HOJ THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THE MORRE LAW GROUP APC - GEOFFREY M. HERSCH