This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 15:17:50 (UTC).

Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries vs. Peter Shaw

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Peter Shaw. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0849

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries

Defendant

Peter Shaw

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL.

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by P.SHAWHearing Date 1/12/2021 Comment Signed for by P.SHAW Hearing Date 1/12/2021

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim e-Filed.

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim e-Filed

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Small Claims - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL. Additional Info: Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by P.SHAWHearing Date 1/12/2021 Comment Signed for by P.SHAW Hearing Date 1/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim e-Filed. Additional Info: Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim e-Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036748-HOJ Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries : Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Baldocchi and Sons dba Pacific Nurseries; Total Financial Assessment $15.00; Total Payments and Credits $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less