Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:17 (UTC).

AUTOVEST LLC vs. ERICA MORRIS, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 AUTOVEST LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERICA MORRIS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L. and Davis, III, Leland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2803

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Davis, III, Leland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST LLC

Defendants

MORRIS, ERIC

DOES 1 THROUGH 15 INCLUSIVE

MORRIS, ERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SU, NANCY Q

SU, NANCY Q.

Defendant Attorney

SCHWINN, FRED W.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 Against.

Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 Against Judicial Officer ORIGINAL FORWARDED TO JUDGE KARE Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Comment Judicial Officer ORIGINAL FORWARDED TO JUDGE KARESH DEPT. 20, COPIES FORWARDED TO JUDGE DAVIS

Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees AND COSTS Comment AND COSTS

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: GRANTING LEAVE TO FILED AMENDED ANSWER Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed Comment Type: GRANTING LEAVE TO FILED AMENDED ANSWER Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed: 01/07/2019

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS Comment AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS served o Comment AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD

Memorandum of Costs.

Memorandum of Costs (SUMMARY) $145.00 Comment (SUMMARY) $145.00

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION RE: Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

Answer (Limited up to $10000).

Answer (Limited up to $10000) General Denial Comment General Denial

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD Comment DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: PARTY REPRESENTED SELF New Attorney: FRED W. SCHWINN Comment Former Attorney: PARTY REPRESENTED SELF New Attorney: FRED W. SCHWINN

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS Comment OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS Comment OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Fee Waiver Granted.

Fee Waiver Granted Signed by MIRNA PATRICIA RIVERA-MARTINEZ DEPUTY COURT CLERK on 09/24/2018 Comment Signed by MIRNA PATRICIA RIVERA-MARTINEZ, DEPUTY COURT CLERK on 09/24/2018

Complaint.

Complaint

Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee).

Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee) FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF AUTOVEST LLC Comment FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF AUTOVEST, LLC

Notice.

Notice OF TAKING MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR Comment OF TAKING MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names: AUTOVEST LLC; MORRIS ERICA; DOES 1 THROUGH 15 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR served on BRYANT M. BURNSTA Comment NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice OF TAKING MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR Comment OF TAKING MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorney Fees. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Attorney Fees 04/23/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Challenge Request against Judicial Officer. Additional Info: Order Granting Challenge Request against Judicial Officer Pursuant to CCP Section 170.6 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Comment Pursuant to CCP Section 170.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS served o Comment AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS Comment AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD Comment DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 Against. Additional Info: Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 Against Judicial Officer ORIGINAL FORWARDED TO JUDGE KARE Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Comment Judicial Officer ORIGINAL FORWARDED TO JUDGE KARESH DEPT. 20, COPIES FORWARDED TO JUDGE DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; ETC... served o Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; ETC... served on BRYANT M. BURNSTAD

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Financial info for MORRIS, ERICA : Fee Waiver $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Financial info for MORRIS, ERICA : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Financial info for MORRIS, ERICA : Fee Waiver $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Financial info for MORRIS, ERICA : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Financial: MORRIS, ERICA; Total Financial Assessment $315.00; Total Payments and Credits $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for AUTOVEST LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037385-HOJ ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for AUTOVEST LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: AUTOVEST LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less