This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 21:35:04 (UTC).

ASWINDRA SINGH ETAL VS FEDERAL EXPRESS ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2012 ASWINDRA SINGH ETAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FEDERAL EXPRESS ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bergeron, Joseph E, Dylina, Steven L, Cretan, Clifford V, Buchwald, Gerald J, Buchwald, Gerald J., Dylina, Steven L., Cretan, Clifford V., Grandsaert, John L, Foiles, Robert D, STEVEN L. DYLINA, GERALD J. BUCHWALD, JOSEPH E. BERGERON, CLIFFORD V. CRETAN and ROBERT D. FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4783

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bergeron, Joseph E

Dylina, Steven L

Cretan, Clifford V

Buchwald, Gerald J

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Dylina, Steven L.

Cretan, Clifford V.

Grandsaert, John L

Foiles, Robert D

STEVEN L. DYLINA

GERALD J. BUCHWALD

JOSEPH E. BERGERON

CLIFFORD V. CRETAN

ROBERT D. FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE, CHRISTOPHER

SINGH, ASHA

SINGH, ASWINDRA

Defendants

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION

FEDEX CORPORATION a corporation

SOOHOO, TIMOTHY

FEDEX FREIGHT, INC a corporation

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION a corporation

FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC a corporation

FEDEX TRUCKLOAD BROKERAGE, INC a corporation

FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC a corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STASKUS, RICHARD J.

84 W. Santa Clara St., Ste 840

San Jose, CA 95113

ALDER, MICHAEL

SILVERS, MICHAEL H.

Defendant Attorney

BALESTRIERI, JOSEPH C

 

Court Documents

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS AND VACATE TRIAL FILED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF SINGH FILED BY FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY JOSEPH C BALESTRIERI

Notice.

NOTICE (6) Comment N: NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION TIMOTHY SOOHOO, FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION.

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION (3) Comment SO2: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SERVERANCE OF TRIALS AND CONTINUANCE OF SIGNED BY JOHN L. GRANDSAERT ON 01/16/15.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ORDER (2) Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 05/16/14

Document.

FILING (11) Comment FILED: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL REINSTATE ACTION AND TO SET A TRIAL, FILED.

Conversion Action.

ATTORNEY Comment AA: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER LEE FILED ASSOCIATING MICHAEL H. SILVERS WITH CURRENT COUNSEL OF RECORD MICHAEL ALDER

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF JOSHUA J. BORGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Notice.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION. Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 02/23/16 AT 9:00AM IN DEPT. 21. Comment IMGDOC: CLERK'S NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 02/23/16 AT 9:00AM IN DEPT. 21.

Document.

STIPULATION RELIABILITY FILED. Comment FILED: STIPULATION RELIABILITY, FILED.

Document.

P/S BY PERSONALLY SERVING SHARON SCHER-MED SCTY RE-DEP SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEAR ETC), FILED. Comment FILED: P/S BY PERSONALLY SERVING SHARON SCHER-MED SCTY RE-DEP SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEAR, ETC), FILED.

Document.

P/S BY PERSONALLY SERVING DR. ANTHONY MATAN (RE- DEPOSITION FOR PERSONAL APPEAR & PROD OF DOCS) FI Comment FILED: P/S BY PERSONALLY SERVING DR. ANTHONY MATAN (RE- DEPOSITION FOR PERSONAL APPEAR & PROD OF DOCS), FILED.

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Order setting aside dismissal filed.

ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL FILED ON 07/20/15 SIGNED BY GRANDSAERT, ON 07/20/15, FILED. Comment OSAD: ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL FILED ON 07/20/15, SIGNED BY GRANDSAERT, ON 07/20/15, FILED.

Document.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL REINSTATE ACTION AND TO SET A TRIAL, FILED. Comment FILED: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, REINSTATE ACTION AND TO SET A TRIAL, FILED.

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION. Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; SOOHOO, TIMOTHY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; SINGH, ASHA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; SINGH, ASWINDRA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: CLERK'S NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 02/23/16 AT 9:00AM IN DEPT. 21. Comment IMGDOC: CLERK'S NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 02/23/16 AT 9:00AM IN DEPT. 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 01/05/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/23/16 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
274 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: AMENDED 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND, FILED. Comment FILED: AMENDED 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for SINGH, ASWINDRA; Case Payment Receipt # 201206290251 SINGH, ASWINDRA $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for SINGH, ASWINDRA; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; SINGH, ASWINDRA; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0251-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

JOSEPH C. BALESTRIERI [SBN. 116321]

ROBINSON & WOOD, INC. 227 N 1st StreetJose, California 95113 SAN MATEQ COUNTY

Telephone: (408) 298-7120 Facsimile: (408) 298-0477

Attorneys for Defendant

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

ASWINDER SINGH AND ASHA SINGH, Case No. CIV 514783

Plaintiffs, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Vs, Complaint Filed: 6/25/2012 FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION; TIMOTHY SOOHOOQ,

Defendants.

COMES NOW defendant TIMOTHY SOOHOO, and in answe‘r to the Complaint of plaintiffs on file herein, admits, denies, and alleges as follows: L Answering all causes of action pled by the above-named plaintiffs, this answering defendant, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 431 .30, denies, both generally and specifically, each and every material allegation, including the damage allegations, in every cause of action élleged. | o II. ( ' AS A FURTHER, SEPARATE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to the Complaint on file herein, this answering defendant believes and thereon alleges that plaintiffs were careless and

negligent in and about the matters complained of and that such carelessness and negligence

negligent in and about the matters complained of and that such carelessness and negligence ROBINSON & WOOD, INC.

ROBINSON & WOOD, INC.

ATTORNEYS AT LAW 795956

NN NN NNONNN@ N &0NN N Ed W =

contributed to the happening of the incident complained of, and the damages, if any, sustained thereby. I1I.

AS A FURTHER, SEPARATE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to the Complaint on file herein, this answering defendant is informed and believes and based thereon alleges that plaintiffs, with full appreciation of the particular risks involved, nevertheless knowiflgly and voluntarily assumed the risks and hazards of the incident complained of, and the damages, if any, resulting therefrom.

AS A FURTHER, SEPARATE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to the Complaint on file herein, this answering defendant alleges that the Complaint fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action against this answering defendagit.

V. ’

AS A FURTHER, SEPARATE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to the complaint on file herein, this answering defendant is informed and belleves and based thereon alleges that plaintiffs causes of action are barred by reason of plamtlffs fallure to mitigate damages, if any.

- AS A FURTHER, SEPARATE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to the complaint on file herein, this answering defendant states that the injuries and damages complained of by plaintiffs, if any there were, were either Wholly or in part directly or proximately caused by the negligent or willful act of person or entities other than this defendant and that said negligence and willfulness is either imputed to plaintiffs, by reason of the relationship bgt_\:veen plaintiffs and said persons or entities, or comparatively reduces the proportion of negligence in correspbnding liability of this defendant. |

WHEREFORE, this answering defendant préys that plaintiffs take nothing by reason of the Complaint on file herein, that this answering defendant be awarded costs of suit

WHEREFORE, this answering defendant préys that plaintiffs take nothing by reason of the Complaint on file herein, that this answering defendant be awarded costs of suit herein incurred, and for such other, further, and different relief as may be deemed appropriate by the Court. Dated: November 9 , 2012 ROBINSON & WOOD, INC.

herein incurred, and for such other, further, and different relief as may be deemed appropriate by the Court. Dated: November 9 , 2012 ROBINSON & WOOD, INC.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX TRUCKLOAD BROKERAGE, INC a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Express Corp is a litigant