This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:19:41 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE VS ANA VARELA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 ASSET ACCEPTANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANA VARELA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4897

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC

Defendants

ANA VARELA

VARELA, ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MERRILL, ANN K

HARRIS, STELIOS A

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (12) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $812.18, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 ---

Judgment by Court.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCT: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 04/18/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC SERVED ON ANA VARELA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/12/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH C.C.P. SECTION 1033(B)(2)

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC AS TO ANA VARELA.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Document.

FILING (19) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B) FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Substitution of Attorney as to.

ATTORNEY Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY ANN K MERRILL REMOVED AS TO ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY STELIOS A HARRIS.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (6) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $201.26, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC; Awarded Against: VARELA, ANA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 04/18/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC FOR ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC AGAINST ANA VARELA PRINCIPAL IS $7,010.68. INTEREST IS $1,342.08. COSTS ARE $290.00. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $8,642.76.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (19) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150416-0529-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $9504.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (12) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $812.18, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140714-0785-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $8869.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (6) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $201.26, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B) FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0219-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280219 ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less