This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 22:10:31 (UTC).

ARNE WILBERG vs. GOOGLE, INC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 ARNE WILBERG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GOOGLE, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond, Foiles, Robert D and SWOPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0442

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

SWOPE

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILBERG, ARNE

Defendants

GOOGLE, INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEDER, DANIEL L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION Comment GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION Signed by: JUDGE Comment Type: JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 03/20/18

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, JURY FEES, ADR PACKET, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, SERVED ON CATHERINE WEBB-CSC- PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION Comment GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Swope V. Raymond; Judgment Type; Stay/Removal; Comment; Comment; (ACTION IS STAYED PENDING BINDING ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order. Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATIONSigned by: JUDGE Comment Type: JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 03/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOOGLE, INC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-018633-HOJ NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOOGLE, INC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: GOOGLE, INC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder sent for signature to Judicial Officer. Additional Info: Comment 23 RE JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment JOINT STIPULATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc.. Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, JURY FEES, ADR PACKET, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, SERVED ON CATHERINE WEBB-CSC- PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILBERG, ARNE : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILBERG, ARNE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: WILBERG, ARNE; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEDER, DANIEL L