This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:57:56 (UTC).

ARACELI RODRIGUEZ V VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 ARACELI RODRIGUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hill, Elizabeth M, Jakubowski, Susan M, Hill, Elizabeth M. and Jakubowski, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6858

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hill, Elizabeth M

Jakubowski, Susan M

Hill, Elizabeth M.

Jakubowski, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARACELLI RODRIGUEZ

Colma, CA 94014

RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI

Defendant

VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR

1137 Montgomery Ave

San Bruno, CA 94066

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSP: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF RODRIGUEZ SERVED BY PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR ON 10/09/12 COSTS $0.00, HEARING DATE 10/29/12.

Bench Warrant as to.

BENCH WARRANT Comment BW: BENCH WARRANT AS TO VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR FILED (ORIGINAL)

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOT FOUND RETURN (NON-ESTUS) WITH FEE OF $75.00 FILED.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

APPLICATION Comment APJD2: (SC) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR FILED BY ARACELLI RODRIGUEZ

Conversion Action.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSOEX: PROOF OF SERVICE OF OEX FILED. VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER ON 04/09/13. COSTS $80.00.

Plaintiff's Claim.

CLAIM Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: RODRIGUEZ ARACELLI; Awarded Against: VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/19/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF RODRIGUEZ FOR ARACELLI RODRIGUEZ JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF RODRIGUEZ AGAINST VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR DEFENDANT(S) VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF(S) ARACELLI RODRIGUEZ $3,616.00 PRINCIPAL AND $50.00 COSTS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/19/12 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES 11/19/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Bench Warrant as to. Additional Info: BENCH WARRANT Comment BW: BENCH WARRANT AS TO VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR FILED (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WARRS: WARRANT OF ARREST FOR VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR WITH BAIL IN THE AMOUNT OF $2500.00 SIGNED BY JUDGE ELIZABETH M. HILL AND FORWARDED TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY VALERIE HRONIS ON 05/20/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PR: ARACELLI RODRIGUEZ PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Comment COMCLK: ELIZABETH M. HILL PRESIDING. CLERK: VALERIE HRONIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Comment HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Judgment Debtor - Appearance. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Comment Dept: SCN HEARING: APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR VH AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $5000.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: CAR IS MISSING, PAID FOR REPAIR WITH 1 YEAR WARRANTY, CAR WAS NEVER PROPERLY FIXED, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0276-CS 004/ 50.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: CLAIM Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI : Case Payment Receipt # 201303040600 RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI : Case Payment Receipt # 201301100189 RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060276 RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: RODRIGUEZ, ARACELLI; Total Financial Assessment $170.00; Total Payments and Credits $170.00

    Read MoreRead Less