This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 10:20:55 (UTC).

Apoorv Bhargava vs. Dheeraj Pandey, et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Apoorv Bhargava filed an Other lawsuit against Dheeraj Pandey,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Karesh, Jonathan E, Grandsaert, John L, Marie S. Weiner and WEINER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4167

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Karesh, Jonathan E

Grandsaert, John L

Marie S. Weiner

WEINER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bhargava, Apoorv

Defendants

Pandey, Dheeraj

Gomo, Steven J

Sangster, David

Conway, Craig

Bostrom, Susan L

Mhatre, Ravi

McAdam, John

Wall, Tyler

Parks, Jeffrey T

Nutanix, Inc.

Attanasio, Louis J

Vadakkedath, Sudheesh N

Long, Kenneth W, III

Williams, Duston M

Scarpelli, Michael P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN, PHONG L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

Request.

Request Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Document: Case Management Order #1 Comment Document: Case Management Order #1

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support Declaration of Phong L. Tran in Support of Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Reques Comment Declaration of Phong L. Tran in Support of Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

Order.

Order Type: DISMISSAL AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment Type: DISMISSAL AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 9-17-19

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received Fwd to Dept. #2[Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request Comment Fwd to Dept. #2[Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of 1) PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT P Comment 1) PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) DECLARATION OF PHONG L. TRAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE 3) PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE served on IGNACIO E. SALCEDA

Complex Case Designation.

~CIV Minute Order - Complex Case Designation 09/05/2019 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order.

Order Type: DISMISSAL AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment Type: DISMISSAL AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 9-17-19

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of 1) PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT P Comment 1) PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) DECLARATION OF PHONG L. TRAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE 3) PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE served on IGNACIO E. SALCEDA

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received Fwd to Dept. #2[Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request Comment Fwd to Dept. #2[Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support Declaration of Phong L. Tran in Support of Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Reques Comment Declaration of Phong L. Tran in Support of Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

Request.

Request Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Document: Case Management Order #1 Comment Document: Case Management Order #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

Order.

Order Order designating case complex and assigning case for all purposes Comment Order designating case complex and assigning case for all purposes

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2019

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2019

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 03:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Initial CMC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names; Bhargava, Apoorv; Pandey, Dheeraj; Williams, Duston M; Sangster, David; Wall, Tyler; Parks, Jeffrey T; Scarpelli, Michael P; Gomo, Steven J; Mhatre, Ravi; McAdam, John; Conway, Craig; Bostrom, Susan L; Vadakkedath, Sudheesh N; Attanasio, Louis J; Long, Kenneth W, III; Nutanix, Inc.; Comment: PEER ORDER FILED ON 9-17-19 GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO DISMISS ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: DISMISSAL AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment Type: DISMISSAL AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 9-17-19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of 1) PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT P Comment 1) PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) DECLARATION OF PHONG L. TRAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE 3) PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APOORV BHARGAVA'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE served on IGNACIO E. SALCEDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received Fwd to Dept. #2[Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request Comment Fwd to Dept. #2[Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support.; Additional Info: Declaration in Support Declaration of Phong L. Tran in Support of Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Reques Comment Declaration of Phong L. Tran in Support of Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRequest.; Additional Info: Request Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Plaintiff Apoorv Bhargava's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing Document: Case Management Order #1 Comment Document: Case Management Order #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Order.; Additional Info: Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
07/22/2019

FinancialFinancial info for Bhargava, Apoorv; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-045654-HOJ Bhargava, Apoorv $1435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2019

FinancialFinancial info for Bhargava, Apoorv; Transaction Assessment $1435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2019

FinancialFinancial; Bhargava, Apoorv; Total Financial Assessment $2,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation.; Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketNew Filed Case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less