This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:53 (UTC).

ANTONIO TORRES vs. ACTION TOWING

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 ANTONIO TORRES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ACTION TOWING. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mazzei, Cristina. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0729

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mazzei, Cristina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES, ANTONIO

Defendant

ACTION TOWING

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/25/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: TORRES, ANTONIODefendant: ACTION TOWING

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim.

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

Authorization to Appear.

Authorization to Appear Brian Banks President. Comment Brian Banks, President.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned.

Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS UNALBE TO FORWARD AS TO PLANTIFF Comment INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS UNALBE TO FORWARD AS TO PLANTIFF

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL.

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by ILLEGIBLE Hearing Date Comment Signed for by ILLEGIBLE Hearing Date

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Mazzei Cristina; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To: ACTION TOWING; Awarded Against: TORRES, ANTONIO; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF.; Party; Names: TORRES, ANTONIO; ACTION TOWING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment Returned INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS UNALBE TO FORWARD AS TO PLANTIFF Comment INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS UNALBE TO FORWARD AS TO PLANTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear. Additional Info: Authorization to Appear Brian Banks President. Comment Brian Banks, President.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • No Longer Under Submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Matter Taken Under Submission. Additional Info: Comment Matter under submission:Small Claims Judicial officer:Mazzei

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/25/2018 Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: TORRES, ANTONIODefendant: ACTION TOWING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL. Additional Info: Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by ILLEGIBLEHearing Date 07/25/2018 Comment Signed for by ILLEGIBLE Hearing Date 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for TORRES, ANTONIO : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037411-HOJ TORRES, ANTONIO $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for TORRES, ANTONIO : Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for TORRES, ANTONIO : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: TORRES, ANTONIO; Total Financial Assessment $65.00; Total Payments and Credits $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less