This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 15:48:17 (UTC).

ANTONIO SOTO RIOS vs. WOODLAND PARK, et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 ANTONIO SOTO RIOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WOODLAND PARK. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and KRISTIN S ESCALANTE, LOS ANGELES COUNTY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4211

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

Not Yet Classified

KRISTIN S ESCALANTE, LOS ANGELES COUNTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIOS, ANTONIO SOTO

Defendants

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL

EQR-WOODLAND PARK A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

EQR-WOODLAND PARK B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

EQR-WOODLAND PARK C LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

WOODLAND PARK

WOODLAND PARK APARTMENTS

EQUITY APARTMENTS

SAND HILL

SAND HILL PROPERTY

SAND HILL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

WOODLAND PARK PROPERTY

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

WOODLAND PARK COMMUNITIES

EQR - WOODLAND PARK A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

EQR - WOODLAND PARK B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

EQR - WOODLAND PARK C LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGARWAL, SANDEEP GOPAL

Defendant Attorney

NICK, JACK C.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing.

Certificate of Mailing

Notice.

Notice of OUTGOING TRANSFER Comment of OUTGOING TRANSFER

Answer.

Answer to COMPLAINT Comment to COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 2 as EQR - WOODLAND PARK B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A DELAWARE Comment NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 2 as EQR - WOODLAND PARK B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDERSigned by: JUDGE KRISTIN S ESCALANTE LOS ANGE Comment Type: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by: JUDGE KRISTIN S ESCALANTE, LOS ANGELES COUNTY JUDGE Date Signed: 12/23/2020

Declaration.

Declaration MINUTE ORDER 10/13/2020 LOS ANGELES COUNTY Comment MINUTE ORDER 10/13/2020, LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Declaration.

Declaration MINURE ORDER 10/13/2020 LOS ANGELES COUNTY Comment MINURE ORDER 10/13/2020, LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee).

Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee) and MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET Comment and MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,6200.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SANDEEP G AARWAL, ESQ.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Ruling.

Notice of Ruling RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE Comment RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee).

Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee) to TRANSFER VENUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLAR Comment to TRANSFER VENUE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JACK NICK; ORDER

Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee).

Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee) and MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE Comment and MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,020.00; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SANDEEP G AARWAL, ESQ.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM Comment NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

Notice.

Notice of CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM Comment of CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

Declaration.

Declaration MINUTE ORDER 12/17/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY Comment MINUTE ORDER 12/17/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT served on LUIS IBARRA PERSON IN CHARG Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT served on LUIS IBARRA, PERSON IN CHARGE

Complaint.

Complaint

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIOS, ANTONIO SOTO : Case Payment Receipt # 2021-031737-HOJ DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS INC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIOS, ANTONIO SOTO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: RIOS, ANTONIO SOTO; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Completion of Transfer of Action. Additional Info: Notice of Completion of Transfer of Action Comment Sent to County LOS ANGELES Originating County Case #: BC685884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for record on transfer received. Additional Info: Receipt for record on transfer received Transfer In Comment Transfer In

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration. Additional Info: Declaration CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS LOS ANGELES COUNTY Comment CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS, LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate - 8.124 - Register of Actions. Additional Info: Clerk's Certificate - 8.124 - Register of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration. Additional Info: Declaration MINUTE ORDER 12/17/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY Comment MINUTE ORDER 12/17/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration. Additional Info: Declaration MINUTE ORDER 9/19/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY Comment MINUTE ORDER 9/19/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer. Additional Info: Answer to COMPLAINT Comment to COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration. Additional Info: Comment MINUTE ORDER 8/15/2019 LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration. Additional Info: Declaration Declaration Comment MINUTE ORDER OF 5/21/19 LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT served on LUIS IBARRA PERSON IN CHARG Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT served on LUIS IBARRA, PERSON IN CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQR-WOODLAND PARK C LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where Sand Hill Property Co is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODLAND PARK APARTMENTS is a litigant