This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 00:09:39 (UTC).

ANTONIO BRAVO-DURAN and KRISTINE KILLILEA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 ANTONIO BRAVO-DURAN and KRISTINE KILLILEA was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holt, Rachel E. and Holt, Rachel E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********44-A

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holt, Rachel E.

Holt, Rachel E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO

Respondent

KILLILEA, KRISTINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation. Additional Info: Original Type Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Visitation Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Respondent: KILLILEA, KRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDocument Returned:. Additional Info: Comment RESPONSE (RECEIVED VIA DROP BOX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO : Case Payment Receipt # 2020-036245-HOJ BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO : Transaction Assessment $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: BRAVO-DURAN, ANTONIO; Total Financial Assessment $550.00; Total Payments and Credits $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCourt Reporter service less than one hour.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order for Modification of. Additional Info: Comment CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA. Additional Info: Comment Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketPetition for Custody and Support of Minor Children.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less