This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 18:06:16 (UTC).

Anthony Davila vs. Robert G. Perez, MD., SETON MEDICAL CENTER, AND DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Anthony Davila filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Robert G Perez, MD , SETON MEDICAL CENTER, AND DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0548

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davila, Anthony

Defendants

Seton Medical Center

Perez, Robert G., MD

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANAHAN, CONOR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Comment Case Management Conference - 2/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GRANAHAN, CONOR

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 2/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GRANAHAN, CONOR

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 2/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GRANAHAN, CONOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 11/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davila, Anthony; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-004850-HOJ Davila, Anthony $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davila, Anthony; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Davila, Anthony; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seton Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANAHAN, CONOR