Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 06:53:19 (UTC).

Anna Hertel vs David Bailey

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Anna Hertel filed an Other lawsuit against David Bailey. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MIRAM, SCOTT, Buchwald, Gerald J., Buchwald, Gerald J, Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7592

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

MIRAM

SCOTT

Judges

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Buchwald, Gerald J

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hertel, Anna

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 - 200, INCLUSIVE

VERITAS BUILDERS

FLEETWOOD WINDOW AND DOORS

Bailey, David

Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc.

Veritas Builders Inc.

LEVEL FIVE DESIGN

BIG OAK HARDWOOD FLOOR COMPANY, INC

AGELESS PLASTERING COMPANY

PACIFIC SASH AND DESIGN

ADANAC FIRE PROTECTION, INC

EUROPEAN ROLLING SHUTTERS

DALE PLUMBING, INC

MARCUCCI HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC

GREEN ELECTRIC

JB TILE & STONE, INC

CREATIE GATES, INC

COAST LIGHTING

ROES 1 THROUGH 1000, INCLUSIVE

87 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYER, JOEL R.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HILLIER, ERIC R

ZINOVYEV, EUGENE X

RENOUF, ASHA L.

NELDER, ROBERT L.

MENDES, PATRICK J.

SNODGRASS, JENNIFER L

SCHELEY, LLOYD T., III

MCCAFFERY, TIMOTHY J.

LEVY, DAVID M.

BROMGARD, TODD D

ALLTON, JOSHUA

BUSTAMANTE, ROBERT M

FISCHER, TODD A.

Other Attorneys

DEL BECCARO, THOMAS GF

STONE, COLETTE F.

BELLOTTI, JEROME P.

O'BRIEN, JILLISA L

LOOMIS, DANIELA N.

LYNCH, JACK D.

 

Court Documents

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CROSS-CO Comment SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CROSS-COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADR INFO SHEET; COMPLAINT; SUMMONS

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SERVICED TO: CHRIS ALVAYERO PERSON IN CHARGE; SUMMONS ON Comment SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT; SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADR INFO SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Answer.

Answer CROSS DEFENDANT WOODSHED DEVELOPMENT DBA PACIFIC SASH AND DESIGN'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment CROSS DEFENDANT WOODSHED DEVELOPMENT DBA PACIFIC SASH AND DESIGN'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

42831Noticeof0005c05

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment CROSS-COMPLAINT; ETC...

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Declaration in Support.

4167216_144Declarati Comment DECLARATION OF SHERYL MILLER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND VACATE December 11 2020 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND TO REINSTATE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

208 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Attorneys David Schack and Serg Daniel appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Attorneys John Kazanovicz and Brandon Gnekow appeared on behalf of the defendants/cross-defendant David Bailey and Veritas Builders. Attorney Robert Nelder appeared on behalf of the defendant/cross-defendant Fleetwood Aluminum Products Inc. Attorney Annie Nguyen appeared on behalf of the cross-complainant/cross-defendant Adanac Fire Protection, Inc. Attorney Jackson Zhou appeared on behalf of the cross-complainant/cross-defendant Ageless Plastering Company. Attorney Doug Wood appeared on behalf of the cross-complainant/cross-defendant Big Oak Hardwood Floor Company, Inc. Attorney Jack Lynch appeared on behalf of the cross-complainant/cross-defendant Epic Drywall, Inc. and cross-defendant Green Electric. Attorney Rick Seely appeared on behalf of the cross-complainant/cross-defendant Level Five Design. Attorney Timothy McCaffery appeared on behalf of the cross-complainant/cross-defendant Woodshed Development. Attorney Todd Fischer appeared on behalf of the cross-defendant JB Tile & Stone, Inc. Attorney Arianna VanMeeteren appeared on behalf of the cross-defendant Kessler Plumbing & Heating, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Case Status Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Complex Case Status Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Complex Case Status Conference 07/23/2021 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Foiles Robert D; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: ADANAC FIRE PROTECTION, INC; Comment: FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GREEN ELECTRIC ON 4/3/20. AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT ADANAC FIRE PROTECTION, INC. ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties). Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
293 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFO SHEE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFO SHEET, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT - SERVED MARK MCCOY, AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hertel, Anna : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-077337-HOJ Hertel, Anna $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hertel, Anna : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Hertel, Anna; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COAST LIGHTING is a litigant

Latest cases where JB TILE & STONE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DALE PLUMBING, INC is a litigant