This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:13:52 (UTC).

ANGELINA MENDIOLA AND RONALDO MENDIOLA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 ANGELINA MENDIOLA AND RONALDO MENDIOLA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8163

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENDIOLA, ANGELINA M

Respondent

MENDIOLA, ROLANDO D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: MENDIOLA ROLANDO D; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: MENDIOLA, ANGELINA M; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 12/07/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANGELINA M MENDIOLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: Comment RDDEF: (FL) REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF MENDIOLA AS TO ROLANDO D MENDIOLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Default Received.. Additional Info: Comment DR: DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF MENDIOLA SERVED ON ROLANDO D MENDIOLA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/01/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Income & Expense Declaration. Additional Info: Comment IE: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANGELINA M MENDIOLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY ANGELINA M MENDIOLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0690-CS 184/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for MENDIOLA, ANGELINA M : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260690 MENDIOLA, ANGELINA M $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for MENDIOLA, ANGELINA M : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: MENDIOLA, ANGELINA M; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less