This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 14:44:38 (UTC).

ANDREW BARE vs. MARY RAGO, et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2016 ANDREW BARE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARY RAGO,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Franchi, Don R, Karesh, Jonathan E, Grandsaert, John L and DuBois, Richard H. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0514

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Franchi, Don R

Karesh, Jonathan E

Grandsaert, John L

DuBois, Richard H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BARE, ANDREW

DOES 1-10

TRUSTEE OF THE RAGO FAMILY TRUST

RAGO, ROBERT

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

RAGO, MARY

TRUSTEE OF THE RAGO FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Coen, Colleen

HENNING, JOHN, III

Cross Defendant Attorney

SCHWARTZ, DONALD C

Other Attorneys

HAWORTH, JAMES W

 

Court Documents

Remittitur.

Remittitur A151485 - The order denying the anti_SLAPP motion is affirmed. Mary shall recover cost o Comment A151485 - The order denying the anti_SLAPP motion is affirmed. Mary shall recover cost on appeal

Opinion received.

Opinion received A151485 Comment A151485

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ANDREW BARE'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRI Comment REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ANDREW BARE'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE "ANTI-SLAPP"; ETC

Transmittal of Record on Appeal.

Transmittal of Record on Appeal A151485 Comment A151485

Notice of Appeal.

Notice of Appeal

Reply.

Reply DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF ANTI-SLAPP MOTION. Comment DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF ANTI-SLAPP MOTION.

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of CROSS DEFENDANT ROBERT RAGO'S NOTICE OF ANTI-SLAPP MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF Comment CROSS DEFENDANT ROBERT RAGO'S NOTICE OF ANTI-SLAPP MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF

Association of Counsel.

Association of Counsel

Remittitur.

Remittitur A151485 - The order denying the anti_SLAPP motion is affirmed. Mary shall recover cost o Comment A151485 - The order denying the anti_SLAPP motion is affirmed. Mary shall recover cost on appeal

Opinion received.

Opinion received A151485 Comment A151485

Remittitur.

Remittitur A151685 Comment A151685

Motion for Attorney Fees.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Attorney's Fees 07/28/2017 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Transmittal of Record on Appeal.

Transmittal of Record on Appeal A151685 Comment A151685

Transmittal of Record on Appeal.

Transmittal of Record on Appeal A151485 Comment A151485

Reply.

Reply DEFENDANT/COSS-COMPLAINANT MARY RAGO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES A Comment DEFENDANT/COSS-COMPLAINANT MARY RAGO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST CROS-DEFENDANT ROBERT RAGO

Opposition.

Opposition TO CROSS COMPLAINANT MARY RAGO'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES Comment TO CROSS COMPLAINANT MARY RAGO'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

Notice of Cost of Clerk's Transcript Fee.

Notice of Cost of Clerk's Transcript Fee A151485 Comment A151485

142 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemittitur.; Additional Info: Remittitur A151485 - The order denying the anti_SLAPP motion is affirmed. Mary shall recover cost o Comment A151485 - The order denying the anti_SLAPP motion is affirmed. Mary shall recover cost on appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpinion received.; Additional Info: Opinion received A151485 Comment A151485

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemittitur.; Additional Info: Remittitur A151685 Comment A151685

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Attorney's Fees 07/28/2017 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmittal of Record on Appeal.; Additional Info: Transmittal of Record on Appeal A151685 Comment A151685

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmittal of Record on Appeal.; Additional Info: Transmittal of Record on Appeal A151485 Comment A151485

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply.; Additional Info: Reply DEFENDANT/COSS-COMPLAINANT MARY RAGO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES A Comment DEFENDANT/COSS-COMPLAINANT MARY RAGO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST CROS-DEFENDANT ROBERT RAGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for RAGO, ROBERT; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-051971-HOJ SCHWARTZ, DONALD C $342.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for RAGO, ROBERT; Transaction Assessment $342.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for RAGO, MARY; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-052019-HOJ Coen, Colleen $273.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BARE, ANDREW; Case Payment Receipt # 2016-030329-HOJ BARE, ANDREW $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BARE, ANDREW; Transaction Assessment $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BARE, ANDREW; Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; BARE, ANDREW; Total Financial Assessment $959.50; Total Payments and Credits $959.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF PENDING ACTION Comment OF PENDING ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James W. Haworth