This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 00:00:46 (UTC).

AMIRA ABEDRABBO AND FRANCISCO ABEDRABBO

Case Summary

On 10/05/2015 AMIRA ABEDRABBO AND FRANCISCO ABEDRABBO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hill, Elizabeth M, RACHEL HOLT, Holt, Rachel E, Cho, Sharon K, Swope, V. Raymond and Padilla, Jr., Rosendo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0674

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hill, Elizabeth M

RACHEL HOLT

Holt, Rachel E

Cho, Sharon K

Swope, V. Raymond

Padilla, Jr., Rosendo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABEDRABBO, AMIRA

Respondent

ABEDRABBO, FRANCISCO F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Comment NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation & Order.; Additional Info: Comment RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ABEDRABBO, AMIRA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045162-HOJ ABEDRABBO, AMIRA $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ABEDRABBO, AMIRA; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketStipulation sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Judge Pro Tem - Norma MacLeod

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Padilla Jr., Rosendo Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
348 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketEx Parte sent to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Comment EFS: EX-PARTE SENT TO DEPARTMENT 23 ON 10/05/15 AT 03:00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151005-0576-CK 078/ 60.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment EPAFL1: (FL) EX-PARTE FEE PAID BY LAW OFFICES OF ROD FIROOZYE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Submitted.; Additional Info: Comment ER: EX-PARTE BY AMIRA ABEDRABBO RECEIVED ON 10/05/15 AT 01:17.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY AMIRA ABEDRABBO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 23 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151005-0574-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less