This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 05:18:23 (UTC).

American Medical Response West, a California corporation vs. San Mateo Health Commission, a public entity, et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 American Medical Response West, a California corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against San Mateo Health Commission, a public entity. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3366

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Medical Response West, a California corporation

Defendants

DOES 1-20, inclusive

HEALTH PLAN OF SAN MATEO, a county organized health system

San Mateo Health Commission, a public entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMIR, MICHAEL M

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of CMC Zoom Comment Case Management Conference - 9/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference Case Management Conference 07/14/2021 ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 7/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 7/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CCCS.pdf

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 9/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 9/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/14/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 7/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 7/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names; American Medical Response West, a California corporation; San Mateo Health Commission, a public entity; HEALTH PLAN OF SAN MATEO, a county organized health system; DOES 1-20, inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 9/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 9/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/14/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 7/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 7/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Comment CMC 3/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for American Medical Response West, a California corporation; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-031039-HOJ American Medical Response West $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for American Medical Response West, a California corporation; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; American Medical Response West, a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN MATEO HEALTH COMMISSION is a litigant

Latest cases where Health Plan of San Mateo is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR, MICHAEL M