This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:05 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS VS SCOTT S MOSHER

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCOTT S MOSHER. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4830

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK

Defendants

SCOT S MOSHER

MOSHER, SCOT S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL (3) Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

Stipulation filed.

STIPULATION Comment STI: (S) STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK SERVED ON SCOT S MOSHER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/30/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIP FOR COND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & DISMISSAL SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 11/26/12 FILED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dispositioned; Party; Name: MOSHER SCOT S; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL (3) Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment *620*: HCMO CALENDARED ON 10/06/15 IN DEPT. TBA. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/06/15 IN DEPT. 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121126-0812-CK 167/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY SCOT S MOSHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CDIS: CASE DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: ORDER Comment O2: ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIP FOR COND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & DISMISSAL SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA ON 11/26/12 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121126-0811-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0491-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Financial info for MOSHER, SCOT S : Case Payment Receipt # 201211260812 MOSHER, SCOT S $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Financial info for MOSHER, SCOT S : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Financial: MOSHER, SCOT S; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260491 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less