This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:13:19 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS VS RODOLFO S. RAMOS

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODOLFO S RAMOS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bergeron, Joseph E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4903

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bergeron, Joseph E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

RODOLFO S. RAMOS

RAMOS, RODOLFO S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

 

Court Documents

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

(L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB FILED BY RODOLFO S. RAMOS, REPRESENTED BY PRO Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FILED BY RODOLFO S. RAMOS, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER - CONTRACT SERVED ON AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB FILED. DATE OF M Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER - CONTRACT SERVED ON AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FILED. DATE OF MAILING 08/25/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Document.

PLAINTIFF'S REVISED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED. Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S REVISED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Amended Answer.

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB FILED BY RODOLFO S. RAMOS. Comment AMEA: AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FILED BY RODOLFO S. RAMOS.

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWER SERVED ON ATTORNEY/FIRM MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES ON 10/27/12 FILED. Comment PSAT: PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWER SERVED ON ATTORNEY/FIRM MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES ON 10/27/12 FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB AS TO RODOLFO Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO RODOLFO S. RAMOS, BY SUB-SERVING TOMMY DOE, STORE MANAGER. MAILING DATE OF 07/30/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY K. CALDWELL ON 10/30/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: TENTATIVE RULING IS VACATED AS AN AMENDED ANSWER HAS BEEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: COURT IS INFORMED THAT DEFENDANT FILED AN AMENDED ANSWER YESTERDAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: 3.1308(A)(1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: TO APPEAR TODAY AS REQUIRED BY LOCAL RULE 3.10 AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: DEFENDANT STATED HE DID NOT PROVIDE NOTICE TO THE COURT AND/OR OPPOSING PARTY/COUNSEL OF HIS INTENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYPP: RODOLFO S. RAMOS PRESENT IN PRO PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THERE IS NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF AMERICAN EXPRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Bergeron Joseph E Comment JCRB: HONORABLE JOSEPH E. BERGERON, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: KAREN CALDWELL, COURT REPORTER: MAUREEN HARTMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Bergeron Joseph E Comment HEARING: MOTION RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0295-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK : Case Payment Receipt # 201210050520 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270295 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less