This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS VS OSWALDO DE ALBA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OSWALDO DE ALBA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4858

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendants

OSWALDO DE ALBA

DE ALBA, OSWALDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGO, BRIAN M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB AS TO OSWALDO DE ALBA, BY SUB-SERVING STEPHANIE DE ALBA, DAUGHTER/CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/13/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: DE ALBA OSWALDO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB AS TO OSWALDO DE ALBA, BY SUB-SERVING STEPHANIE DE ALBA, DAUGHTER/CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/13/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment *XFR: --> CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/514858 TO CLJ/514858.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0652-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280652 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less