This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:19:30 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS VS CASSIDY S. DELACRUZ

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASSIDY S DELACRUZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4893

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB,

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

CASSIDY S. DELACRUZ

DELA CRUZ, CASSIDY S.

CRUZ, CASSIDY DELA

DELACRUZ, CASSIDY S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB,

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, SERVED ON CASSIDY S. DELACRUZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/14/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: DELACRUZ CASSIDY S.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Statement. Additional Info: NOTICE Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB, SERVED ON CASSIDY S. DELACRUZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/14/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0250-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280250 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less