This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/22/2018 at 22:27:20 (UTC).

AMELIA CERVANTES VS SEQUOIA CHILDREN'S CENTER

Case Summary

On 05/09/2014 AMELIA CERVANTES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SEQUOIA CHILDREN'S CENTER. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L., Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8504

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERVANTES, AMELIA

Defendants

SEQUOIA CHILDREN'SCENTER

FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LADVA, ASHWIN

530 Jackson St., 2Nd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

TRINH, MAGGIE W

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH Comment REP2: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF MAGGIE W. TRINH IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF MAGGIE W. TRINH IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 03/29/16 Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 03/29/16

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF MAGGIE W. TRINH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY STIPULATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF MAGGIE W. TRINH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY STIPULATION FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON ASHWIN LADVA ESQ. WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/15 Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON ASHWIN LADVA, ESQ. WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 07/01/15 FILED.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMELIA CERVANTES. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMELIA CERVANTES.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH.

Request for Judicial Notice.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST UNITED ME Comment RJN: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH.

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Grandsaert John L.; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Comment; Comment; (UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketCourt Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment Dept: PJ COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Comment WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Unconditional Comment Type: Unconditional

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketConversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketSettlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mandatory Settlement Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/05/16 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT PJ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketConversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketCourt Trial. Additional Info: Original Type Court Trial Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Conversion Continuance Comment Dept: PJ COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
266 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH : Case Payment Receipt # 201508240672 FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH : Case Payment Receipt # 201508240354 FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH : Case Payment Receipt # 201507020212 FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketFinancial info for FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH : Transaction Assessment $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketFinancial: FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH; Total Financial Assessment $1,295.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,295.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • DocketFinancial info for CERVANTES, AMELIA : Case Payment Receipt # 201405090243 CERVANTES, AMELIA $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • DocketFinancial info for CERVANTES, AMELIA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • DocketFinancial: CERVANTES, AMELIA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First United Methodist Chrurch is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LADVA, ASHWIN V.