This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 00:27:04 (UTC).

ALYSSA K SOTO and GERARDO SARIEL MORAN

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 ALYSSA K SOTO and GERARDO SARIEL MORAN was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Franchi, Don R, Mazzei, Cristina, Borja, Hugo R, Burdick, Sarah P and SARAH P. BURDICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1695

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Franchi, Don R

Mazzei, Cristina

Borja, Hugo R

Burdick, Sarah P

SARAH P. BURDICK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOTO, ALYSSA K

Respondent

MORAN, GERARDO SARIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

CANNY, PAULA K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Signed By: HON. SARAH P. BURDICK Date Signed: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Burdick Sarah P. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: SOTO, ALYSSA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: SOTO, ALYSSA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: SOTO, ALYSSA KRespondent: MORAN, GERARDO SARIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge.; Additional Info: Comment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Mazzei Cristina Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: SOTO, ALYSSA KRespondent: MORAN, GERARDO SARIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Unsuccessful Service.; Additional Info: Comment ATTEMPTED TO SERVE: GERARDO SARIEL MORAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Application - DV Prevention without Minor Child File Date 10/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte sent to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge.; Additional Info: Comment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order.; Additional Info: Comment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketConfidential CLETS Information RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less