This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 03:25:48 (UTC).

AJ VASQUEZ, et al vs. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 AJ VASQUEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0947

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ, AJ

VASQUEZ, JESSICA

Defendants

NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES, INC

ATI RESTORATION, LLC

ATI

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLOAN, DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for VASQUEZ, AJ; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-008450-HOJ VASQUEZ, AJ $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for VASQUEZ, AJ; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; VASQUEZ, AJ; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATI is a litigant

Latest cases where ATI Restoration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant