This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:47:22 (UTC).

AIMEE JUNGMAN VS GENOMIC HEALTH, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 AIMEE JUNGMAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GENOMIC HEALTH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Grandsaert, John L, Dylina, Steven L. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8972

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Grandsaert, John L

Dylina, Steven L.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIMEE JUNGMAN

JUNGMAN, AIMEE

Defendants

BRAD COLE

KIM MCEACHRON

KIM POPOVITZ

GENOMIC HEALTH, INC.

JIM VAUGHN

MCEACHRON, KIM

VAUGHN, JIM

POPOVITZ, KIM

COLE, BRAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DHILLON, HARMEET K

NEWHOUSE, MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

BAUM, JOHN F

505 Montgomery Street 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: HARMEET K. DHILLON New Attorney: PRO PER Comment Former Attorney: HARMEET K. DHILLON New Attorney: PRO PER

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT Comment REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF ERIC SAPERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEF REPLY TO PLA OPPOSITION TO MOT TO TRANSFER ACTION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF ERIC SAPERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEF REPLY TO PLA OPPOSITION TO MOT TO TRANSFER ACTION

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF AIMEE JJUNGMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLA OPPOSITION TO DEF MOT TO TRANSFER ACTION FILED BY A Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF AIMEE JJUNGMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLA OPPOSITION TO DEF MOT TO TRANSFER ACTION FILED BY AIMEE JUNGMAN

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF MPA IN OPP TO DEF MOT TO TRANSFER ETC SERVED ON AIMEE JUNGMAN WITH Comment PSN: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF MPA IN OPP TO DEF MOT TO TRANSFER, ETC SERVED ON AIMEE JUNGMAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/22/16 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION FILED BY GENOMIC HEALTH INC., Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF JENNIFER MAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION FILED BY GENOMIC HEALTH, INC., KIM POPOVITZ, JIM VAUGHN, BRAD COLE, KIM MCEACHRON

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. PERSON SERVED: AMY DURGAN ESQ. Comment PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. PERSON SERVED: AMY DURGAN ESQ.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of COURT CALL APPEARANCE SERVICE COPY. SERVED ON-SEE SERVICE LIST. Comment COURT CALL APPEARANCE SERVICE COPY. SERVED ON-SEE SERVICE LIST.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited

Document.

TRANSFER RECEIPT FILED. Comment FILED: TRANSFER RECEIPT, FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF SHAREEN FOUSEKIS IN SUPORT OF DEF REPLY TO PLA OPPOSITION TO MOT TO TRANSFER ACTION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF SHAREEN FOUSEKIS IN SUPORT OF DEF REPLY TO PLA OPPOSITION TO MOT TO TRANSFER ACTION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY AIMEE JUNGMAN IN IN OPPOSITION TO DEF MOTION TO TRANS Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY AIMEE JUNGMAN IN IN OPPOSITION TO DEF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF JIM VAUGHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION FILED BY GENOMIC HEALTH INC., KI Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF JIM VAUGHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION FILED BY GENOMIC HEALTH, INC., KIM POPOVITZ, JIM VAUGHN, BRAD COLE, KIM MCEACHRON

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GENOMIC HEALTH INC., KIM POPOVITZ, JIM VAUGHN, BRAD Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GENOMIC HEALTH, INC., KIM POPOVITZ, JIM VAUGHN, BRAD COLE, KIM MCEACHRON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 3-16-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mandatory Settlement Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Comment WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney: MICHAEL NEWHOUSE Comment Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney: MICHAEL NEWHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 21 ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • 1st Time Extension granted for Filing of Stipulation to ADR. Additional Info: Comment TO 1/13/17 BY MC PER DEFENSE COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial info for GENOMIC HEALTH, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-024590-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial info for GENOMIC HEALTH, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial: GENOMIC HEALTH, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Financial info for JUNGMAN, AIMEE : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-037484-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Financial info for JUNGMAN, AIMEE : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for JUNGMAN, AIMEE : Case Payment Receipt # 201606091226 JUNGMAN, AIMEE $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Financial info for JUNGMAN, AIMEE : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for JUNGMAN, AIMEE : Case Payment Receipt # 201606060267 JUNGMAN, AIMEE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial info for JUNGMAN, AIMEE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Financial: JUNGMAN, AIMEE; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less