Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 08:29:39 (UTC).

AIDAN C. VS REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/14/2012 AIDAN C filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cretan, Clifford V, Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Buchwald, Gerald J, Scott, Joseph C., Buchwald, Gerald J., Dylina, Steven L. and Cretan, Clifford V.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7510

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cretan, Clifford V

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Buchwald, Gerald J

Scott, Joseph C.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Dylina, Steven L.

Cretan, Clifford V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C., AIDAN

Defendants

BOGDIS, ALEXIA

BARRIGA, ANA

LEAKE, BROOKE

ZINNATI, JULIE

BARAJAS, ROCIO

REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

GONZALEZ, AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMANUEL, TODD P.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHUMB, CHRISTOPHER E.

DAVIS, MARK E.

WILLIAMS, RICHARD M

 

Court Documents

Order.

ORDER (4) Comment O2: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR, PERSON WITH A DISABILITY, SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 04/21/15 FILED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE (37) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY AIDAN C.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER (3) Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF C. FILED BY AMBER GONZALEZ JULIE ZINNATI, ANA BARRIGA, BROOKE LEAKE, ROCIO BARAJAS, REPRESENTED BY RICHARD M WILLIAMS

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

NOTICE (11) Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF C. AS TO BROOKE LEAKE FILED. SIGNED BY: RICHARD WILLIAMS. DATE SIGNED: 03/06/14

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION WITH SUPPORTING DOCS SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST BY FAX WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/07/14.

Ex Parte.

APPLICATION Comment EPA: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO VACATE MSC AND TRIAL DATES FILED BY AIDAN C.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF TODD P. EMANUAL ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (3) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL (12) Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

ATTORNEY Comment AA1: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT ALEXIA BOGDIS FILED ASSOCIATING MARK E. DAVIS WITH CURRENT COUNSEL OF RECORD CHRISTOPHER E. SCHUMB

Document.

FILING (6) Comment FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC/ACK OF RCPT AS TO AMBER GONZALEZ; ANA BARRIGA; ET AL FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE (8) Comment N2: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY AIDAN C..

Order.

ORDER (3) Comment O2: ORDER GRANTING EXPARTE APL. TO VACATE MSC AND JURY TRIAL AND RESET CMC SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 03/07/14 FILED.

Amendment filed. Naming Doe/Roe.

COMPLAINT (2) Comment ATCND: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF C. FILED; NAMING DOE/ROE 1 AS AMBER GONZALEZ

Motion.

NOTICE (7) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY AIDAN C.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER (2) Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (4) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALEXIA BOGDIS.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: LEAKE BROOKE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BARAJAS, ROCIO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BARRIGA, ANA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ZINNATI, JULIE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: GONZALEZ, AMBER; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BOGDIS, ALEXIA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: C., AIDAN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE (38) Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL & PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL (12) Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY ARUN DASS ON 04/28/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/28/15 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: MINORS COMPROMISE HAS JUST BEEN COMPLETED AND PLAINTIFF IS NOW JUST WAITING FOR FUNDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CACC: COUNSEL BARRY D. BROWN FOR DEFENDANT APPEARED BY COURT CALL.

    Read MoreRead Less
270 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2013
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201307020090 C., AIDAN $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201307020087 C., AIDAN $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201303280731 C., AIDAN $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201210230190 C., AIDAN $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201210230142 C., AIDAN $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Financial info for C., AIDAN : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Financial: C., AIDAN; Total Financial Assessment $1,035.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,035.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDWOOD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schumb, Christopher E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, RICHARD M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MARK E.