This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/28/2022 at 16:49:46 (UTC).

AGATON T GUALBERTO, et al vs. WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB, et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 AGATON T GUALBERTO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Grandsaert, John L., Chou, Danny Y, Grandsaert, John L and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0794

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Grandsaert, John L.

Chou, Danny Y

Grandsaert, John L

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUALBERTO, AGATON T

GUALBERTO, VIRGINIA C

Defendants

WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB

ALDRIGE, PITE, LLP

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

FIRST AMERICAN MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS

PITE, STEVEN W (CEO)

KOZUBAL, JOANNA

MCCARTHY, KEVIN R (AGENT

BELLA ROSES VENTURES LLC

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

STENMAN, JEFFREY (CFO)

DOES 1-100

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

ALL PERSONS OR ENTITIES UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

KMENTING, DUANE R (ATTORNEY AT LAW)

CLEAR RECON CORP

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Order to Show Cause.

Order to Show Cause OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 8/20/19 Comment OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 8/20/19

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/07/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/07/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Complaint.

Complaint

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/07/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/07/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely 11/26/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 11/26/19 Comment for Lack of Prosecution 11/26/19

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely 08/20/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Order to Show Cause.

Order to Show Cause OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 8/20/19 Comment OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 8/20/19

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely 11/26/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Mail returned undelivered Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment Document: NOTICE OF 11/26/19 HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 11/26/19 Comment for Lack of Prosecution 11/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely 08/20/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause.; Additional Info: Order to Show Cause OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 8/20/19 Comment OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution 8/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/05/2019 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Comment CMC 7/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/07/2019 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/07/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for GUALBERTO, AGATON T; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-008161-HOJ GUALBERTO, AGATON T $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for GUALBERTO, AGATON T; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; GUALBERTO, AGATON T; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aldridge Pite, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD SAVINGS BANK FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where McCarthy Holthus LLP is a litigant